Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Office of the Inspector General and an Advisory Board for the Office; establishing that the Advisory Board has the powers to appoint and remove the Inspector General; providing for the position, term, qualifications, and authority of the Inspector General; providing that certain records are not subject to disclosure; providing that disclosure of a protected record is a misdemeanor; authorizing the Inspector General to adopt regulations to carry out the Act; requiring certain reports; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7.5-101 through 7.5-112 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:18 PM
Click to return on the top page