Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to allow a developer to upgrade an existing facility for a specified use necessary for the developer's project under specified circumstances; requiring that a specified upgraded facility be designed, constructed, and inspected in accordance with specified standards, laws, regulations, and written policies; requiring the Commission to accept a specified facility as part of the Commission system and grant the developer a specified credit under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page