Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish a Customer Affordability Program for a specified purpose; requiring the Commission to establish income eligibility standards for specified ratepayers to receive financial assistance under the Program; requiring specified income eligibility standards to be applied uniformly throughout the Washington Suburban Sanitary District; and providing for the funding of the Program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page