Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Korman, and Rosenberg
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "campaign material" to include certain material that is disseminated and certain qualifying paid digital communications; altering the definition of "public communication" to include certain qualifying paid digital communications that require a person who makes independent expenditures of a certain amount to file an independent expenditure report with the State Board; requiring, under certain circumstances, an online platform to apply for a compliance waiver before receiving certain payment; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0875
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Impallaria) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134534/1
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134534/1
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134534/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {743923/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {793929/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-38)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {905669/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Impallaria) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {134534/1 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zucker) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {134534/1 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {134534/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {743923/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {793929/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-1) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (94-38) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Text - Chapter - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
(   1-101, 13-306, 13-307, 13-401, 13-403, 13-405, 13-405.1, 13-405.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page