Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to be the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; establishing the Department as a principal department of the Executive Branch of State government; providing that the head of the Department is the Secretary of Emergency Management; requiring the Secretary to be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; transferring the Maryland 9-1-1 Board from the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to the Department; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {826681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {826681/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page