Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Modification
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying specified standards for the involuntary admission of specified individuals who have experienced a drug overdose to specified facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital to include an individual who has a mental disorder or is not a minor, has experienced a drug overdose, and has health insurance coverage as a dependent on the parent's health insurance plan; modifying specified standards for petitions for the emergency evaluation of specified individuals who have experienced a drug overdose; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Modification
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-617, 10-622, 10-623, 10-632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page