Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the administrative and operational expense cap of the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System and the State Retirement Agency for fiscal years 2019 through 2022 under certain circumstances; altering the basis for the calculation of the administrative and operational expense cap; applying the Act; and making certain sections of the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0784
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 and 4 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Text - Chapter - Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page