Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified nitrogen oxide emissions rates for specified affected electric generating units from exceeding specified amounts; requiring the owner or operator of an affected electric generating unit to submit a specified plan for approval to the Department of the Environment and the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency on or before November 15, 2015; requiring that the plan include specified information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-10A-01 through 2-10A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page