Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Acevero
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland People's Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the State Treasurer to administer the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; and requiring the Comptroller to distribute to the Fund 25% of the Maryland estate tax.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page