Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Voluntary Payment by Victim for Testing of Kit
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee to develop a process to allow the victim of a sexual assault to elect to pay for the testing of a sexual assault evidence kit.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Voluntary Payment by Victim for Testing of Kit
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Voluntary Payment by Victim for Testing of Kit
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page