Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Hornberger
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying in Cecil County a specified provision of law that authorizes the issuance of a Class 7 micro-brewery license to a holder of a Class B beer, wine, and liquor (on-sale) license that is issued for use on the premises of a restaurant.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   17-401, 2-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page