Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, Hill, Korman, Lierman, Shetty, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to administer the Program; authorizing certain persons to apply to the Administration in fiscal years 2021 through 2023 for a rebate for the cost of acquiring certain electric vehicles; authorizing the Administration to issue a $3,000 rebate for certain new vehicles and a $1,500 rebate for certain used vehicles; providing that, for each fiscal year, the total amount of rebates issued may not exceed $8,000,000; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Energy Administration - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   9-2010, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page