Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsored by
Delegate Knotts
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a lender from maintaining an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property in the State for a specified period of time; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study, evaluate, and make recommendations regarding specified foreclosure alternatives and report its findings to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2016; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page