Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing for the composition of the Board and the appointment, terms, and expenses of the Board members; providing that the Act does not prohibit specified persons from providing services under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0010 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   22-101 through 22-802 )
(   2-106.10, 2-106.9, 2-108 )
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page