Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers MC 3-16
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license in Montgomery County, as of July 1, 2018; authorizing a holder of an alcoholic beverages license in Montgomery County, beginning July 1, 2018, to elect to purchase alcoholic beverages from a licensed wholesaler in addition to or instead of from the Department of Liquor Control; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of Montgomery County; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   12-216, 15-204, 6-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page