Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Coal Ash - Use, Recycling, and Management (Coal Ash Recycling Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain materials used in the State include coal ash as a component of the material; requiring certain offshore wind projects to give preference to certain cement materials beginning on June 1, 2022; requiring all contractors licensed in the State to use and give preference to materials that include coal ash; requiring any person utilizing materials in the State that include coal ash to give preference to certain materials, hire local employees for certain work, and submit certain information; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Coal Ash - Use, Recycling, and Management (Coal Ash Recycling Act of 2022)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9-291 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:40 PM
Click to return on the top page