Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Emergency Management to take action to reduce the disaster risk and vulnerability of critical infrastructure; establishing the Critical Infrastructure Cybersecurity Grant Program in the Department to leverage certain funds to make cybersecurity improvements to critical infrastructure; altering the duties and staffing requirements of the Public Service Commission to include cybersecurity; authorizing the Office of People's Counsel to retain or hire an expert in cybersecurity; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0810
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:40 PM
Click to return on the top page