Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Stadium Authority)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to prepare certain studies and, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, develop certain supplemental facilities and supplemental facility sites within Baltimore City that directly or indirectly benefit the sports facilities at Camden Yards; requiring certain notice to the governing body of Baltimore City; authorizing the Authority to issue certain bonds; establishing the Supplemental Facilities Fund to pay expenses related to a supplemental facility; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (138-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (138-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Appropriations 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-622.1 through 10-622.5, 10-628, 10-657.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page