Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, McMillan, Otto, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations to require that certain stormwater management infrastructure for a development or redevelopment project in a certain locally designated historic district be designed in a manner to protect the physical integrity of the stormwater management infrastructure during a 100-year storm event; and defining "qualified historic district" and "repetitive loss property".
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {100817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {100817/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
(   4-201.1, 4-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page