Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Kipke, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, by May 31, 2019, the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to adopt a certain conflict of interest policy; requiring annual financial disclosures; requiring the Board to ensure that the Corporation continues to be a private, nonprofit, nonstock corporation; altering the composition of, and the appointment process for, the Board; prohibiting inclusion of a State or local elected official; prohibiting a member of the Board from intentionally using the prestige of office for private gain; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {916486/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Board of Directors, Ethics, and Performance Audit
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {916486/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Board of Directors, Ethics, and Performance Audit
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {287775/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text - Chapter - University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
(   13-301, 13-303, 13-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page