Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury – Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, Conaway, Hayes, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, and the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board jointly to study the under-identification of traumatic brain injuries among school-aged children and to recommend a process to identify children with existing traumatic brain injuries in schools; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, and the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board to report their findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2019.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Student Health Screenings - Brain Injury
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student Health Screenings - Brain Injury
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {285266/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury – Study and Report
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page