Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Chang, Gaines, Stein, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office for Children to fund family navigation services to support parents and other caregivers of children or youth with behavioral health needs or developmental disabilities and to address certain other priorities concerning children and youth; specifying that the services be provided by certain family navigators as determined by local management boards; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of not less than $1,665,915 for the services in the annual budget each fiscal year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and Funding
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   8-101, 8-6A-01 through 8-6A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page