Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request)
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the compensation of the members of the Maryland Court of Appeals, the Maryland Court of Special Appeals, the circuit courts, and the District Court of Maryland.
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0005
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214467/2 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {133221/2 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (41-88)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-31)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {214467/2 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Floor Amendment {133221/2 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (41-88) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (105-31) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Returned Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Text - Chapter - Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page