Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the number and altering the qualifications of the incorporators required to form a commercial bank or a savings bank in the State; repealing certain provisions relating to additional and vacant directorships of certain commercial banks; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-1)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Favorable Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Referred Economic Matters 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (125-1) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Age
(   3-201, 3-202, 3-407, 3-408 through 3-411, 4-201, 4-202 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page