Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office for Children)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of the Special Secretary for Children, Youth, and Families to impose a civil penalty on members of the State Citizens Review Board for Children and the Board's designees and staff for unauthorized disclosure of specified child protection case information; and authorizing the Secretary of Human Resources to impose a civil penalty of up to $500 on members of the Board and the Board's designees and staff for unauthorized disclosure of specified child protection case information.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judiciary 18
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58A
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
(   5-535, 5-539, 5-539.1, 5-539.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page