Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to prepare a certain recommendation in connection with certain issues considered by the Public Service Commission; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to incorporate an evaluation of the impact of certain electric power plants on climate change into the Power Plant Research Program; requiring the Commission to consider the maintenance of fair and stable labor standards and the protection of the global climate in supervising and regulating certain public service companies; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0298
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0656 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2020
Legislative Date
10/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117073/1
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {117073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {473920/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-41)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2020 10/19/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {117073/1 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Committee Amendment {117073/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Floor Amendment {473920/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Economic Matters 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-41) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page