Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to enter into an agreement with a county or other subdivision of the State to conduct surveys and perform other work related to noxious weeds or other plant species within the county or subdivision; providing that the agreement between the Secretary and the county or subdivision of the State may be terminated by either party on 30 days' written notice; and defining "subdivision of the State" to include a soil conservation district.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Text - Chapter - Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
(   9-403 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page