Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that certain provisions of law relating to peace orders may not be interpreted to create or impose a duty on a certain employer to file a petition on behalf of a certain employee; making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0289
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0126 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958673/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958673/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {453324/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Refuses Recede 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Refuses Recede 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page