Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environmental Health Specialists and On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Transfer of Responsibilities and Standards, Regulations, Applications, and Plans
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring certain provisions of law governing environmental health specialists, including the Board of Environmental Health Specialists, from the Maryland Department of Health to the Department of the Environment; requiring the Department of the Environment to take certain actions regarding applications and plans for the installation of on-site sewage disposal systems; requiring that an application for the installation of an on-site sewage disposal system be approved or denied within 2 months after receipt by the approving authority; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1068
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environmental Health Specialists and On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Transfer of Responsibilities and Standards, Regulations, Applications, and Plans
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-101, 11-101 through 11-502, 11-103, 11-202, 11-301, 11-302, 11-306, 11-312, 11-313, 11-314, 11-402, 1-406,   9-1114 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page