Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from 2,000 to 1,000, the number of hours of experience required of an applicant to qualify for a real estate appraisal license for residential or general real estate appraisal and from 2,000 to 1,500, the number of hours of experience required of an applicant to qualify for a certificate for residential or general real estate appraisal; increasing from 2 to 3 years the time period during which an individual may apply for reinstatement of a certain license or a certain certificate to provide certain services ;etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2019
Legislative Date
9/23/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117170/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2019 9/23/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {117170/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Text - Chapter - Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
(   16-302, 16-310, 16-503, 16-512, 16-5A-04, 16-5A-05 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page