Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the court to investigate the ability to pay court fines by defendants who fail or are unable to pay a fine; repealing authorization and procedures for a court to order an individual committed to a correctional facility for nonpayment or inability to pay court fines; and authorizing the court to authorize the clerk of the court to approve an individual installment payment plan under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1331
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
Senate 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:52 PM
Click to return on the top page