Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles; requiring the Task Force to determine the most effective and appropriate best practices for governing self-driving vehicles based on a review of specified information; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make specified recommendations; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0008
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0778 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page