Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Somerset County from not less than $60,000 to not less than $75,000; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0148
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 23
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page