Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain employers of commercial motor vehicle drivers to provide the U.S. Department of Transportation number of any entity currently owned by the employer and website address for the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration's Safety and Fitness Records (SAFER) System to a prospective employee driver on a bona fide offer of employment; and providing certain civil penalties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1074
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1036 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 452
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Inspection, Performance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran's Law)
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page