Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purposes for which certain compliance fees paid into the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund may be used; requiring at least 50% of certain energy-related loans and grants made by the Maryland Energy Administration to directly benefit low-income residents of the State; requiring certain vehicle excise tax credits for the purchase of certain electric vehicles to be issued from the Transportation Trust Fund under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 6/9/2021 8:51 AM
Click to return on the top page