Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the eligibility for a retirement allowance for certain members of the Judges' Retirement System who reach the mandatory retirement age required by Article IV, § 3 of the Maryland Constitution and have less than 5 years of eligibility service.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0164
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Referred Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text - Chapter - Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page