Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion and Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, on review and approval of the Secretary of Agriculture or the Secretary's designee, the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue a cease and desist order against a person who practices, attempts to practice, or offers to practice veterinary medicine in violation of certain laws or takes certain actions; specifying that a civil penalty imposed under the Act may not exceed $5,000 for a first offense or $10,000 for a second or subsequent offense; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Practicing Veterinary Medicine Without a License - Cease and Desist Order and Civil Penalty
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {174236/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244
Text - Chapter - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
(   2-313.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page