Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notices, Protests, Meetings, and Conflict Resolution
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the property owners that the Department of Natural Resources is required to notify of applications for certain aquaculture leases to be issued in the Chesapeake Bay or the Atlantic Coastal Bays; requiring the Department to work with a certain petitioner and a certain applicant to mitigate certain concerns and to consider conflict resolution between shoreline property owners and aquaculture lease applicants before issuing a lease; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0711 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notices, Protests, Meetings, and Conflict Resolution
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:09 PM
Click to return on the top page