Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of certain provisions of law relating to medical stop-loss insurance.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page