Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision – Conditions, Violations, and Petitions for Discharge
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the persons for whom a sentence is required to include a term of lifetime sexual offender supervision; requiring inclusion of certain conditions for lifetime sexual offender supervision; requiring a sexual offender management team to report a certain violation of a condition of lifetime sexual offender supervision to the office of a certain State's Attorney; requiring a certain judge to conduct a certain hearing; authorizing a certain judge to act in a certain matter under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/21/2020
Legislative Date
9/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/21/2020 9/21/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision – Conditions, Violations, and Petitions for Discharge
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page