Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Madaleno, Robinson, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Kelley)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the driver of a vehicle to drive on the left side of the roadway in a no-passing zone to overtake and pass a bicycle, farm equipment, a farm tractor, or an animal-drawn vehicle in accordance with a certain provision of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0222
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458973/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458973/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458973/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (25-21)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {723724/1 (Senator Jennings)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {723724/1 (Senator Jennings)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (25-21) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Floor Amendment {723724/1 (Senator Jennings) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Floor Amendment {723724/1 (Senator Jennings) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kelley) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
(   21-305, 21-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page