Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from conducting or contracting for animal testing in the development of a cosmetic; prohibiting a manufacturer from selling or offering for sale in the State a cosmetic under certain circumstances beginning July 1, 2022; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not apply to certain animal testing; prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting or enforcing provisions of local law relating to animal testing on cosmetics; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0611
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/06/2020
Legislative Date
7/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-38)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/06/2020 7/06/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Second Reading Passed 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-38) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page