Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from employing an individual not registered with the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers to provide specified tax preparation services; providing specified employees of the Field Enforcement Bureau of the Comptroller's Office with specified police powers when enforcing specified laws; authorizing the Attorney General to bring a specified civil action to enjoin a person from acting as an income tax preparer under specified circumstances; imposing a penalty on specified income tax preparers for specified offenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0424
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Taxpayer Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {299335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Taxpayer Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {592112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Taxpayer Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Taxpayer Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Taxpayer Protection Act
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {299335/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Taxpayer Protection Act
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {592112/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Taxpayer Protection Act
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text - Chapter - Taxpayer Protection Act
(   10-911, 13-1004, 13-201, 13-203, 13-703, 13-706.1, 13-715, 2-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page