Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the term "podiatrist" to be "podiatric physician".
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0790
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0169 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page