Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Guzzone
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize the risk of bird collisions; requiring each building constructed, acquired, or substantially altered by the Department to meet certain standards related to the types of glass used and the transparency of passageways and corners to the extent practicable; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing public buildings using automatic control technologies to the extent practicable; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0136
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1009 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604031/1
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604031/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-18)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (25-21)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496682/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604031/1 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604031/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (29-18) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (25-21) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {496682/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page