Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating certain findings of the General Assembly related to the value of fishing and hunting to the cultural and social heritage and the economy of the State; and establishing that it is the intent of the General Assembly that residents of the State have a right to fish and to hunt subject to regulations and restrictions under laws that the General Assembly enacts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1134
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-102, 4-103 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page