Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law specifying that certain provisions of law apply only to adoptions in which a juvenile court enters an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000; altering, from 21 to 18, the age at which an adoptee, or biological parent if the adoptee is at least 18 years old, may apply for a copy of certain birth and adoption records; requiring the Director of Social Services to develop and make available a certain contact preference form; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0999
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1039 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Smith) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Rejected (16-31) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page