Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Veterans Affairs)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person who charges a fee for certain veterans benefits services or veterans benefits appeals services to provide a written disclosure statement to and obtain written acknowledgment of the disclosure statement from certain individuals under certain circumstances; requiring a certain person who charges a fee for providing certain veterans benefits appeals services to include a certain notice in advertisements for those services; establishing a civil penalty of up to $1,000 for each violation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text - Chapter - Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
(   9-905.1, 9-913 )
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page