Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Hayes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing pharmacists to prescribe and dispense preexposure prophylaxis and postexposure prophylaxis for HIV prevention to patients under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide drugs that are approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for HIV prevention; prohibiting managed care organizations, certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from requiring prior authorization for certain drugs for HIV prevention; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0828 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Senate 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653326/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page