Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Nondisparagement Clause in Settlement Agreement
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use or enforcement of a nondisparagement clause in a settlement agreement or other release of liability between the parties in a claim of misconduct in the performance of duties against a law enforcement officer of an institution of higher education in Baltimore City; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {788076/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City – Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education – Prohibition Against Nondisclosure Provision in Settlement Agreement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {788076/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Nondisparagement Clause in Settlement Agreement
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page